Signed in as:

filler@godaddy.com

Signed in as:

filler@godaddy.com

Welcome! Here you can find different math tricks to help you excel in your problem solving abilities.

A lotus pond each day doubles the lotus on the surface of the pond. On August 15th, the pond was completely covered by lotus flowers. On which day was the pond covered by half of the lotus flowers?

Answer: August 14th, since the lotus doubles every day, the amount of lotus the day prior is always half of the lotus the day of.

Similar Question:

A bacteria doubles itself every hour. At 5 pm there were 8 million bacteria in a bottle. What time did it reach 1 million?

Answer: 2 pm, since the bacteria doubles every hour, every hour prior, there are 1/2^n fraction of bacteria where n is the number of hours before 5pm.

14 x 16 = ?

Solution:

14 x 16 = (15 - 1)(15 + 1) = 15^2 - 1

15^2 = 225

14 x 16 = 225 - 1 = 224

Examples:

24 x 26 = (25 - 1)(25 + 1) = 625 - 1 = 624

1 + 2 + 3 + . . . + 97 + 98 + 99 = ?

Solution:

1. 1 + 2 + 3 + . . . + 99 = (1 + 99) + (2 + 98) + . . . + (49 + 51) + 50

2. 100 x 49 + 50 = 4950

Therefore: 1 + 2 + 3 + . . . + 98 + 99 = 4950

Examples:

2 + 4 + 6 + 8 = (2 + 8) + (4 + 6) = 10x2 = 20

To find the sum of arithmetic sequences you can add the first and last terms together and then multiply it by the amount of terms divided by two

33^2 + 56^2 = n^2

Solution:

33^2 + 56^2 = 1089 + 3136 = 4225 = 65^2

Therefore: If you see a right triangle with side lengths of 33 and 65, then you know the last side will be 65.

Pythagorean Triples can be used to quickly calculate the remaining side of a right triangle if you know already know 2 sides. Other pairs are:

- (3,4,5)
- (5,12,13)
- (7,24,25)
- (9,40,41)

45*45 = ?

Step by Step Calculation:

1) 4*(4 + 1) = 20

2) 20*100 + 25 = 2025

Therefore: 45*45 = 2025

To Summarize:

n5*n5 = n(n+1)*100 + 25

For Example:

25*25 = 2*3*100 + 25 = 625

105*105 = 10*11*100 + 25 = 11,025

146 + 8*6 - 145 = ?

Step by Step Calculation:

1) Rewrite as (8*6) + (146 - 145)

2) 146 - 145 = 1

8*6= 48

Therefore: 1 + 48 = 49

To Summarize:

You can rewrite equations as separate smaller equations which can then be solved much easier than the whole thing.

For Example:

87 + 6*4 - 37 + 63

(6*4) + (87-37+63) = ?

24 + 113 = 137

27x7=?

Step by Step Calculation:

1) 27x(10-3)

2) 270-81=189

Therefore: 27x7=189

To Summarize:

nx7=nx(10-7)=nx10-nx3

For Example:

45x7=45x(10-3)=450-135=315

3/4m−2(m−1)=1/4m+5

Solve for m

In order to solve this equation, we will need to multiply each side by 4 to get 3m – 8(m – 1) = m + 20. Then from here, we will need to distribute the parenthesis to get 3m – 8m - 8 = m + 20. After this we need to combine like terms and subtract 2m from both sides. Then we will need to subtract 8 from both sides. Lastly we need to divide 12 by -6 to get m = -2.

Copyright © 2023 Duo Pisces Mobile App - All Rights Reserved.

Powered by GoDaddy

We use cookies to analyze website traffic and optimize your website experience. By accepting our use of cookies, your data will be aggregated with all other user data.